skip to content

Sherlock, Kevin Edward

CPSO#: 25194

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Aug 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1983