skip to content

Sheriton, Jack Edmund

CPSO#: 19226

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 9 Tullamor Drive Willowdale, ON M2L 2E9
Date Received: 05 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014