skip to content

Sherif, Abdulaziz Abubeker

CPSO#: 92629

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jimma University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 31 Jan 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2019