skip to content

Shergill, Arvind Kaur

CPSO#: 97100

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Arvind Shergill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 09 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 10 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 May 2019