skip to content

Sher, Faiz Syed

CPSO#: 85813

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Dec 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Faiz Syed Sher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 15 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010