skip to content

Sheps, Rachel Lynn

CPSO#: 90871

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue Room 206
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165865058
Fax: (416) 586-4719 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
Emergency Dept
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Canada
Phone: 4162421000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rachel Sheps Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sheps ( CPSO# 90871 )

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL LYNN SHEPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2012