skip to content

Sheppard, Rachael Yvonne

CPSO#: 95494

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 O'Brien Street
Suite 301
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 418-0240
Fax: 705-327-5255 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

4142 Yellowhead Trail
Rama ON  L3V 6H6
Canada
Phone: 705-325-3611 Ext. 1601
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rachael Sheppard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sheppard ( CPSO# 95494 )

Business Address:
301 - 16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 418-0240

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHAEL YVONNE SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013