skip to content

Sheppard, Miranda Elizabeth

CPSO#: 86419

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SOAHAC
425-427 William Street
London ON  N6B 3E1
Phone: (519) 672-4079
Fax: (519) 672-6945 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Miranda Sheppard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sheppard ( CPSO# 86419 )

Business Address:
425 - 427 William Street
London ON  N6B 3E1
Phone Number: (519) 672-4079

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIRANDA ELIZABETH SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009