skip to content

Sheppard, Matthew Jacob

CPSO#: 95452

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wasser Pain Management Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Health Comp
600 University Avenue, 20th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-596-4200 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JACOB SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2018 to 21 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 31 Mar 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016