skip to content

Shepherd, James Victor

CPSO#: 23526

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hawthorne Medical Clinic 1201 Queen Street Kincardine ON N2Z 3C1 Tel: (519) 396-6749
Date Received: 30 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Nov 1991 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019