skip to content

Shepherd, Frances Alice

CPSO#: 28668

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Aug 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
700U-7-812
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4522
Fax: (416) 946-6546 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Frances A. Shepherd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Shepherd ( CPSO# 28668 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
700U-7.812
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRANCES ALICE SHEPHERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPHERD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1976