skip to content

Shen, Xiou Seeger

CPSO#: 90433

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Cardiology Associates
Unit 307
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 735-1111
Fax: (705) 735-1888 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46215
Fax: (705) 739-5698
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. X. S. Shen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Shen ( CPSO# 90433 )

Business Address:
125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 307
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 735-1111

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XIOU SEEGER SHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2009 to 28 Jun 2009
EL - Cardiology

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2009 to 19 Jul 2009
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014