skip to content

Sheikh, Osmaan

CPSO#: 97493

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 07 May 2012 to 04 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 2015