skip to content

Sheikh, Adnan Mohammad

CPSO#: 85550

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Bangalore University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Adnan Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sheikh ( CPSO# 85550 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:03 Jun 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2019 Active
             Dr. Adnan Mohammad Sheikh may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.