skip to content

Sheikh, Adeel Ali

CPSO#: 89112

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Urology
Suite 304
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-7120
Fax: (905) 472-2971 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

7191 Yonge St
Suite 1111
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Canada
Phone: 9055977661
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adeel Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sheikh ( CPSO# 89112 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ontario

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADEEL ALI SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013