skip to content

Sheik-Yousouf, Mohammad Amir

CPSO#: 89434

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y1T7
Phone: 4166185940 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

6990 Derry Road, Suite 102
Milton ON  L9T 7H3
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-8888
Fax: (905) 878-9322
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amir Sheik-Yousouf Medicine Practice Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sheik-Yousouf ( CPSO# 89434 )

Business Address:
82 Classic Dr
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H3
Phone Number: 4166185940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD AMIR SHEIK-YOUSOUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEIK-YOUSOUF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013