skip to content

Shefrin, Allan Evan

CPSO#: 89865

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
Div of Paediatric Emergency Med
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allan Shefrin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shefrin ( CPSO# 89865 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Paediatric Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLAN EVAN SHEFRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEFRIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010