skip to content

Shear, Neil Hartley

CPSO#: 31499

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 May 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1-700
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Grenville Street
Dermatology, 5th floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Neil H. Shear Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021