skip to content

Satgunam, Shean

CPSO#: 86031

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
22 Ambleside blvd.
Winnipeg MB  R3P 1E3
Phone: 204-895-3785

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHEAN SATGUNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATGUNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 25 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Dr. Shean Satgunam (June 15, 2018) Allegations of Dr. Satgunamā€™s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that between approximately 2011 and 2017, Dr. Satgunam engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to provide complete and/or accurate information in a timely manner to the College and/or hospitals and/or other institutions, including in the context of his completion of applications for registration and Annual Renewals and applications for appointment and/or reappointment, regarding matters such as legal proceedings, peer review proceedings and privileges issues.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): September 3-6, September 16-19, October 7,8 and 11, 2019