skip to content

Shea, Alison Kathleen Audrey

CPSO#: 95878

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
301 James St S, 2F- Fontbonne Build
L8P 3B6
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905)383-3336 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alison Shea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shea ( CPSO# 95878 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
2F - Fontbonne Building
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALISON KATHLEEN AUDREY SHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017