skip to content

Seit, Shawn Chi Wai

CPSO#: 60776

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1010
32 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Phone: (416) 291-0033 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

5314 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M2N 5P9
Canada
Phone: 905 695 6956
Fax: 905 513 9538
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shawn Seit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Seit ( CPSO# 60776 )

Business Address:
Suite 1010
32 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Phone Number: (416) 291-0033

Business Address:
5314 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5P9
Phone Number: (905) 695-6956

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAWN CHI WAI SEIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Seit’s professional have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Seit engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in that, amongst other things, he: a. Performed Out-of-Hospital Premises (“OHP”) procedures, that are required to be performed in an approved OHP, without having the required approval; b. Billed for OHP procedures that he provided in an unapproved premises; and c. Practised in a manner that is in breach of the Out-of-Hospital Premises Inspection Program Standards. Dr. Seit failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, including in his care of patients, whose identities are disclosed under separate cover.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Disclosure Motion: April 28, 2021 Hearing Dates: July 19 - 23 & July 28 - 30, 2021