skip to content

Shaw, Kerrie Anne

CPSO#: 91006

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Equipe De Sante Familiale
Credit Valley
Site B Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: (905) 6070921 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2300 Eglinton Ave West, Suite 101
Credit Valley Family Health Team
and Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: (905) 813-3853
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kerrie Anne Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shaw ( CPSO# 91006 )

Business Address:
Equipe De Sante Familiale
Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 813-3850

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KERRIE ANNE SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 29 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012