skip to content

Sharma, Varun

CPSO#: 97994

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019