skip to content

Sharma, Shalini

CPSO#: 94513

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shalini Sharma and Edward McNally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 94513 )
Dr. E. McNally ( CPSO# 96884 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHALINI SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Oct 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2013