skip to content

Sharma, Rajrishi

CPSO#: 84785

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
335-401 9th Ave SW
Calgary AB  T2P 3C5
Phone: (403) 221-4359
Fax: (403) 221-4387

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rajrishi Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJRISHI SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011