Sharma, Rajesh (CPSO#: 100145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4525 ebenezer road
Brampton ON  L6P2K8
Phone: 9057942003
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajesh Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sharma ( CPSO# 100145)

Business Address:
Suite 1
4525 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K8
Phone Number: (905) 794-2003

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJESH SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014