skip to content

Sharma, Neerja

CPSO#: 89065

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Thames Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1S4
Phone: (519) 397-4766
Fax: (519) 397-5213 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

80 Grand Ave West
Chatham Kent Health Alliance Hospit
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Canada
Phone: (519) 437-6707
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Neerja Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma ( CPSO# 89065 )

Business Address:
65 Thames Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 397-4766


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEERJA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 18 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013