skip to content

Sharma, Manas

CPSO#: 90146

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Nepali, Other

Education:Gauhati University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
PO Box 5339 Station B
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3203
Fax: (519) 663-8803 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017
Corporation Name: Manas Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sharma ( CPSO# 90146 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Division of Neuroradiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3203


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:08 Jan 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 13 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Neuroradiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neuroradiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Mar 2013
CF - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021 Active
 Dr. MANAS SHARMA may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.