skip to content

Sharma, Bal Krishan

CPSO#: 87076

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ROYAL VICTORIA HOSPITAL
201 GEORGIAN DR
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (519) 872-1607 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 TERRACE HILL ST
Brantford ON  N3R1G9
Canada
Phone: 5198721607
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

450 BLANCHE ST
Petrolia ON  N0N1R0
Canada
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sharma ( CPSO# 87076 )

Business Address:
201 GEORGIAN DR
BARRIE ON  L4M M2
Phone Number: 5198721607

Business Address:
2073 INNISFIL HEIGHTS CRESCENT
INNISFIL ON  L9S A8
Phone Number: 5198721607

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BAL KRISHAN SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010