skip to content

Sharma, Anuja

CPSO#: 97380

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
IM Care
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 377-7793
Fax: (905) 373-6969 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bhargava Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bhargava ( CPSO# 97340 )
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 97380 )

Business Address:
Heart Care Cardiac
Wellness Centre
Medical Sciences Building
372 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 268-8882

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7793


Corporation Name: Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2020 Active
             Dr. Anuja Sharma may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, with
            a special interest in treating conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin.