skip to content

Sharma, Anand

CPSO#: 99240

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 21 Aug 2012 to 13 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013