skip to content

Sharif, Zahra

CPSO#: 100494

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anova Fertility and
Reproductive Health
Suite 650 and 690
25 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone: (416) 225-4440 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

295 College St.
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Canada
Phone: 416-925-5511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

489 College St Suite 200
Toronto ON  M6G1A5
Canada
Phone: 416-323-9986
Fax: 416-323-0447
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAHRA SHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 28 Jul 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2016