skip to content

Sharif, Nadder

CPSO#: 98231

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nadder Sharif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Strathcona Community Hospital, 9000 Emerald Drive, Sherwood, Alberta T8H 0J3
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019