skip to content

Sharif, Ismail Abdelwahab

CPSO#: 100550

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013