skip to content

Shareef, Raghad

CPSO#: 89105

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postmaster Medical Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone: (905) 844-1700
Fax: (905) 844-1705 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

374 Lakeshore Rd E.
Mississauga ON  L5G1H5
Canada
Phone: 905- 232-7002
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shareef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shareef ( CPSO# 89105 )

Business Address:
Postmaster Medical Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 844-1700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAGHAD SHAREEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAREEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2011