skip to content

Sharda, Rajan Kumar

CPSO#: 90795

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: 6139384240 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 109 - 705 Cotton Mill St.
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 932-9494
Fax: (613) 932-0265
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

20260 County Rd 43
Alexandria ON  K0C1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 932-9494
Fax: (613) 932-0265
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. K. Sharda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sharda ( CPSO# 90795 )

Business Address:
109 - 705 Cotton Mill Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Phone Number: (613) 932-9494

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5


Corporation Name: Priti Sharda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sharda ( CPSO# 90795 )
Dr. P. Sharda ( CPSO# 101850)

Business Address:
Unit 109
705 Cotton Mill Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Phone Number: (613) 932-9494

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAJAN KUMAR SHARDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 08 Jun 2009 to 01 Jul 2009
EL - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013