skip to content

Shapero, Jonathan

CPSO#: 91743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745-3344
Fax: (416) 745-3205 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jonathan Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shapero ( CPSO# 91743 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-1091

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN SHAPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011