skip to content

Shanmugarajah, Gnanaraj

CPSO#: 89211

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
Suite 100
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Shanmugarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shanmugarajah ( CPSO# 89211 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GNANARAJ SHANMUGARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011