skip to content

Shanmugam, Ganesh

CPSO#: 95034

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Section of Cardiac Surgery
Foothills Medical Centre
Room C831
1403 29th Street NW
Calgary AB  T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-8443
Fax: (403) 944-2906

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ganesh Shanmugam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:22 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GANESH SHANMUGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2012