skip to content

Shanmugalingam, Arany

CPSO#: 91313

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Gordon Street
Ontario Shores Centre
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Arany Shanmugalingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shanmugalingam ( CPSO# 91313 )

Business Address:
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARANY SHANMUGALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Psychiatry

Western University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014