skip to content

Shamshudin, Rashida

CPSO#: 93106

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Birmingham, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 McEwan Drive East
Suite 203
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone: 905-951-1575
Fax: 855-933-2690 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bolton Walk-in Clinic
170 McEwan Drive East, Suite 105
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Canada
Phone: (905) 857-3260
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rashida Shamshudin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shamshudin ( CPSO# 93106 )

Business Address:
105-170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone Number: (905) 857-3260

Business Address:
203-170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone Number: (905) 951-1575

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RASHIDA SHAMSHUDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMSHUDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 02 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2012