skip to content

Shammas, Nouri

CPSO#: 29747

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nouri I. Shammas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: 102 Dunvegan Road, Toronto, Ontario M4V 2P7
Date Received: 15 Jan 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 2020