skip to content

Shamji, Farid Mohammedali

CPSO#: 33328

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1982
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Campus - Ottawa Hospital
6NW Room 6361
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 74053
Fax: (613) 737-8668 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Farid M. Shamji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Shamji ( CPSO# 33328 )

Business Address:
General Campus - Ottawa Hospital
6NW - Room 6361
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 1, 2019
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 1, 2019, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Farid Shamji has agreed to an interim leave of absence from his practice at The Ottawa Hospital.

On March 6, 2019, The Ottawa Hospital further notified the College that Dr. Farid Shamji has voluntarily resigned his privileges at The Ottawa Hospital.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 14, 2019
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 14, 2019, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.2 and 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Farid Shamji has, effective immediately, agreed to restrict his clinical practice at The Ottawa Hospital by not taking first call, performing endoscopy or scrubbing in the operating room.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 23, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 26, 2018, The Ottawa Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective July 23, 2018, Dr. Farid Shamji voluntarily restricted his practice at The Ottawa Hospital by no longer acting as most responsible physician in the operating room.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARID MOHAMMEDALI SHAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982