skip to content

Shalabi, Maher Saleh Ali

CPSO#: 86384

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 19 Aug 2007
PEAP - R - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 20 Aug 2007 to 19 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 20 Aug 2008 to 19 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 20 Aug 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 23 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 24 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 16 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Oct 2014
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2014