skip to content

Shakouripartovi, Amirali

CPSO#: 99688

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
801 Pacific Ave.
Tacoma WA  98402
United States
Phone: 2536271001

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMIRALI SHAKOURIPARTOVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKOURIPARTOVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 04 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2013 to 01 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014