skip to content

Shakib, Alireza

CPSO#: 92200

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Willowdale Medical Clinic
6023 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 3W2
Phone: (416)916-2733
Fax: (416)916-2315 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alireza Shakib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALIREZA SHAKIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 28 Sep 2009 to 16 Dec 2009
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 17 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Sep 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2016

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 2, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)