skip to content

Hussain, Shaimaa

CPSO#: 114794

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34
main street west
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone: (905) 7290412
Fax: 9057480266 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

14872 Yonge st.
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 505-0950
Fax: (905) 841-9404
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Wisam Jaber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Jaber ( CPSO# 111233)
Dr. S. Hussain ( CPSO# 114794)

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
34 Main Street West
Beeton ON  L0G 1A0
Phone Number: (905) 729-0412

Business Address:
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
25 William Graham Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 3G3
Phone Number: (905) 841-3450

Business Address:
1700 King Road
King City ON  L7B 0N1
Phone Number: (905) 833-8421

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Dec 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAIMAA HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 May 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2019