skip to content

Shaikh, Sameer Yasin

CPSO#: 98574

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway Hospital
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington, ON L7S 0A2
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905-599-5852
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shaikh ( CPSO# 98574 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Joesph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 681-4812

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMEER YASIN SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017