Shaikh, Rizwan Ahmed (CPSO#: 100019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Mar 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Sind Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lormel Medical Centre
Unit 8
10 Lormel Gate
Brampton ON  L7A 2K7
Phone: (905) 846-5335
Fax: (905) 846-2666
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rizwan A. Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shaikh ( CPSO# 100019)

Business Address:
Lormel Medical Centre
10 Lormel Gate
Suite 8
Brampton ON  L7A 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 846-5335

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 May 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 19 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Rizwan Ahmed Shaikh may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.