skip to content

Shaikh, Omer Sharif

CPSO#: 87635

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rainbow Pediatrics
204 - 589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone: (905) 646-5437
Fax: (905) 646-5438 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Omer Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Shaikh ( CPSO# 87635 )

Business Address:
2 - 2 Lakeshore Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 7E4
Phone Number: (905) 646-5437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:24 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009 Active
             Dr.  Omer  Sharif  Shaikh  may  practise medicine independently in Paediatrics,
            only.